FL S0102 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on August 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-08-28 - Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Criminal Justice; Rules
Pending: Senate Commerce And Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibiting an employer from inquiring into or considering an applicant's criminal history on an initial employment application unless otherwise required to do so by law, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Discrimination in Employment Screening

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-28SenateReferred to Commerce and Tourism; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Criminal Justice; Rules
2017-08-09SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S380 (Similar To) 2017-11-03 - Withdrawn from further consideration
H433 (Same As) 2017-11-01 - Referred to Careers and Competition Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee; Commerce Committee
S702 (Similar To) 2017-11-08 - Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Education; Appropriations; Rules

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
760105Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback