FL H0431 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1-1)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1-1)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires specified licensed pharmacists to report certain information to DOH; authorizes pharmacists to test for & treat influenza & streptococcus; provides requirements with respect thereto; requires that written protocol between pharmacist & supervising physician contain certain information, terms, & conditions; requires that pharmacists provide evidence of current certification by Board of Pharmacy to supervising physician; requires that pharmacists submit their written protocols to board.
Title
Testing for and Treatment of Influenza and Streptococcus
Sponsors
House Health Quality Subcommittee | Rep. Rene Plasencia [R] | Rep. Byron Donalds [R] | Rep. Katie Edwards [D] |
Rep. Cary Pigman [R] | Rep. David Santiago [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | House | Died in Health and Human Services Committee |
2018-03-10 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-19 | House | Now in Health and Human Services Committee |
2018-01-19 | House | CS referred to Health and Human Services Committee |
2018-01-19 | House | Original reference(s) removed: Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2018-01-18 | House | CS by Health Quality Subcommittee read 1st time |
2018-01-18 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2018-01-16 | House | CS by Health Quality Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 2 |
2018-01-11 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health Quality Subcommittee, 01/16/18, 11:30 am, Mashburn Hall |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2017-11-01 | House | Referred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2017-10-25 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S524 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Policy
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
381 | 0031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
465 | 003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
465 | 1895 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |