FL H0417 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increases the number of county court judges authorized for St. Johns County.
Title
County Court Judges
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | Died in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-02-08 | House | Now in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-01-25 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S816 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Judiciary, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5301 (Ch. 2021-45)
H5301 (Similar To) 2021-06-03 - Chapter No. 2021-45; companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500 (Ch. 2021-36)
H5301 (Similar To) 2021-06-03 - Chapter No. 2021-45; companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500 (Ch. 2021-36)
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/417 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/417/BillText/Filed/PDF |