FL H0417 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires Florida Commission on Human Relations to create & publish model sexual harassment prevention policy & model sexual harassment prevention training program; requires employers to use model policy & program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Workplace Sexual Harassment

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03HouseDied in Civil Justice Subcommittee
2019-05-03HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-01-30HouseReferred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Business and Professions Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
2019-01-22HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1580 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Commerce and Tourism

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
76065Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback