FL H0331 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-26 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 694 (Ch. 2021-125)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-26 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 694 (Ch. 2021-125)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires local governments to pay specified amount of compensation to displaced private waste companies at end of specified notice period; removes provision authorizing local governments to pay specified amount of compensation to private waste companies as alternative to delaying displacement for specified period.
Title
Displacement of Private Waste Companies
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-24 - House - House State Affairs Committee (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - House Regulatory Reform Subcommittee (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - House Regulatory Reform Subcommittee (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-26 | House | Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 694 (Ch. 2021-125) |
2021-04-13 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2021-04-13 | House | Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading |
2021-04-08 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/13/2021) |
2021-03-24 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2021-03-24 | House | Bill released to House Calendar |
2021-03-24 | House | Reported out of State Affairs Committee |
2021-03-24 | House | Favorable by State Affairs Committee |
2021-03-22 | House | Added to State Affairs Committee agenda |
2021-03-21 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2021-03-21 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2021-03-18 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2021-03-17 | House | CS Filed |
2021-03-17 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2021-03-17 | House | Reported out of Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2021-03-17 | House | Favorable with CS by Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2021-03-15 | House | Added to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee agenda |
2021-03-03 | House | Now in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2021-03-03 | House | Reported out of Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2021-03-03 | House | Favorable by Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-03-01 | House | Added to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee agenda |
2021-02-03 | House | Now in Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2021-02-03 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2021-02-03 | House | Referred to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2021-02-03 | House | Referred to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2021-01-19 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S694 (Same As) 2021-06-23 - Chapter No. 2021-125