FL S0694 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-23 - Chapter No. 2021-125
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-23 - Chapter No. 2021-125
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Environmental Protection to review and update its report on retail bags and submit the updated report to the Legislature by a specified date; requiring a local government to pay a specified amount of compensation to a displaced private waste company at the end of a specified notice period; removing a provision authorizing a local government to pay a specified amount of compensation to a private waste company as an alternative to delaying displacement for a specified period; defining the term "storm-generated yard trash", etc.
Title
Waste Management
Sponsors
Senate Appropriations Committee | Senate Community Affairs Committee | Sen. Ray Rodrigues [R] | Sen. Keith Perry [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-27 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#319 (Y: 112 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#15 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate Community Affairs (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate Environment and Natural Resources (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#15 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate Community Affairs (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate Environment and Natural Resources (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-23 | Chapter No. 2021-125 | |
2021-06-21 | Approved by Governor | |
2021-06-16 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2021-04-27 | House | Message sent to senate |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2021-04-27 | House | CS passed; YEAS 112, NAYS 2 |
2021-04-27 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-26 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2021-04-26 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2021-04-26 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-23 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2) |
2021-04-23 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/26/2021) |
2021-04-23 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2021-04-21 | House | In Messages |
2021-04-21 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-20 | Senate | CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/21/21 |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2021-04-18 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2021-04-15 | Senate | CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 17 NAYS 3 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/19/21, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2021-04-12 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/15/21, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Remaining references corrected to Appropriations |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Original reference(s) removed: Rules |
2021-04-01 | Senate | CS by Community Affairs read 1st time |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2021-03-30 | Senate | CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/30/21, 3:30 pm, 37 Senate Building |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Now in Community Affairs |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Favorable by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2021-02-08 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 02/15/21, 3:30 pm, 37 Senate Building |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources; Community Affairs; Rules |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H331 (Same As) 2021-04-26 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 694 (Ch. 2021-125)
H1563 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee
S1348 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Environment and Natural Resources, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 694 (Ch. 2021-125)
H1563 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee
S1348 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Environment and Natural Resources, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 694 (Ch. 2021-125)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
403 | 703 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 7033 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 70605 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 7071 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |