FL H0319 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Public Safety & Domestic Security Policy (CCJP)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Public Safety & Domestic Security Policy (CCJP)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that payments made by county or municipality to provider for certain services for an arrested person be made at state's Medicaid rate.
Title
Medical Expenses/Inmates/County or Municipality
Sponsors
Sen. Ed Hooper [R] | Sen. Darryl Rouson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Public Safety & Domestic Security Policy (CCJP) | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Public Safety & Domestic Security Policy (CCJP); Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA); Health Care Regulation Policy (HFPC); Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council -HJ 00033; On Committee agenda-- Public Safety & Domestic Security Policy (CCJP), 02/02/10, 8:00 am, 404-H --Temporarily deferred; On Committee agenda-- Public Safety & Domestic Security Policy (CCJP), 02/16/10, 10:15 am, 404-H --Temporarily deferred | |
2010-02-09 | On Committee agenda-- Public Safety & Domestic Security Policy (CCJP), 02/16/10, 10:15 am, 404-H --Temporarily deferred | |
2010-01-26 | On Committee agenda-- Public Safety & Domestic Security Policy (CCJP), 02/02/10, 8:00 am, 404-H --Temporarily deferred | |
2009-11-20 | Referred to Public Safety & Domestic Security Policy (CCJP); Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA); Health Care Regulation Policy (HFPC); Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council | |
2009-11-06 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0218 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages