FL H0303 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 436 (Ch. 2017-74)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 436 (Ch. 2017-74)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes public school students & school personnel to express religious viewpoints & engage in certain religious activities without discrimination; provides for enforcement of such rights under Religious Freedom Restoration Act of 1998.
Title
Religious Expression in Public Schools
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-04 | House | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 436 (Ch. 2017-74) |
2017-04-04 | House | Substituted SB 436 |
2017-03-30 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/04/17 |
2017-03-23 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-03-23 | House | Favorable by- Education Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-21 | House | On Committee agenda-- Education Committee, 03/23/17, 9:00 am, Reed Hall |
2017-03-20 | House | Now in Education Committee |
2017-03-20 | House | CS referred to Education Committee |
2017-03-20 | House | Original reference(s) removed: Judiciary Committee |
2017-03-16 | House | CS by PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee read 1st time |
2017-03-16 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2017-03-14 | House | CS by PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-10 | House | PCS on Committee agenda-- PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee, 03/14/17, 2:00 pm, Reed Hall |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred to PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee; Education Committee |
2017-01-19 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0436 (Same As) 2017-06-12 - Chapter No. 2017-74
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1002 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 205 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/303 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/0303/BillText/Filed/PDF |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/303/BillText/c1/PDF |