FL H0303 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires family day care homes & large family child care homes to conspicuously display their licenses or registrations in common area of homes; prohibits advertising of child care facility, family day care home, or large family child care home unless it is licensed or registered.
Title
Licensing of Facilities that Offer Health & Human Services
Sponsors
House Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee | House Healthy Families Subcommittee | Sen. Lori Berman [D] | Sen. Darryl Rouson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | House | Died in Health and Human Services Committee |
2014-04-02 | House | Now in Health and Human Services Committee |
2014-04-01 | House | CS/CS by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee read 1st time |
2014-03-31 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2014-03-31 | House | CS/CS by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-27 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/31/14, 11:00 am, Webster Hall |
2014-03-12 | House | Now in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2014-03-10 | House | CS by Healthy Families Subcommittee read 1st time |
2014-03-10 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2014-03-05 | House | CS by Healthy Families Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-04 | House | Introduced |
2014-03-03 | House | On Committee agenda-- Healthy Families Subcommittee, 03/05/14, 1:00 pm, 12 HOB |
2013-12-13 | House | Referred to Healthy Families Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2013-11-12 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0394 (Same As) 2014-05-02 - Died in Appropriations
H7069 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in returning Messages
S1702 (Similar To) 2014-04-30 - Laid on Table
H7069 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in returning Messages
S1702 (Similar To) 2014-04-30 - Laid on Table
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1002 | 88 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
402 | 302 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
402 | 313 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
402 | 3131 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
402 | 315 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
402 | 317 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
402 | 318 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |