FL H7069 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in returning Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in returning Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Changes terminology relating to school readiness & family day care; revises certain requirements & standards relating to child care facilities, VPK program, & school readiness program; revises provisions relating to exemption from certain licensing standards; revises duties of Office of Early Learning & early learning coalitions.
Title
Early Learning and Child Care Regulation
Sponsors
House Appropriations Committee | House Education Appropriations Subcommittee | House Education Committee | Rep. Marlene O'Toole [R] |
Sen. Frank Artiles [R] | Rep. Ron Saunders [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#53 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#52 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#611 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#52 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#611 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | House | Died in returning Messages |
2014-05-02 | House | In returning messages |
2014-05-02 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Amendment(s) reconsidered, adopted as amended (143520, 361654, 840922) |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (143520, 361654, 840922) |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Substituted for CS/SB 1702 |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Withdrawn from Education; Appropriations |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Received |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Referred to Education; Appropriations |
2014-04-22 | Senate | In Messages |
2014-04-22 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 117 NAYS 0 |
2014-04-22 | House | Read 3rd time |
2014-04-21 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2014-04-21 | House | Amendment(s) adopted (258569, 601439) |
2014-04-21 | House | Read 2nd time |
2014-04-17 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/21/14 |
2014-04-04 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-04-03 | House | CS/CS by Appropriations Committee read 1st time |
2014-04-03 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) |
2014-04-01 | House | CS/CS by- Appropriations Committee; YEAS 24 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-28 | House | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 04/01/14, 2:30 pm, Webster Hall |
2014-03-27 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2014-03-27 | House | CS referred to Appropriations Committee |
2014-03-25 | House | CS by Education Appropriations Subcommittee read 1st time |
2014-03-25 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) |
2014-03-24 | House | CS by- Education Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-20 | House | On Committee agenda-- Education Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/24/14, 12:30 pm, Morris Hall |
2014-03-11 | House | Referred to Education Appropriations Subcommittee |
2014-03-04 | House | Introduced |
2014-02-26 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0303 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Health and Human Services Committee
S0394 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Appropriations
S1702 (Similar To) 2014-04-30 - Laid on Table
S0394 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Appropriations
S1702 (Similar To) 2014-04-30 - Laid on Table
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1001 | 213 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 53 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 55 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 59 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 61 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 63 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 71 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 75 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 77 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 81 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 82 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 84 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 87 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 88 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 89 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 91 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 94 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
125 | 0109 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
166 | 0445 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 604 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
402 | 302 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
402 | 3025 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
402 | 305 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
402 | 3085 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
402 | 311 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
402 | 3115 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
402 | 313 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
402 | 3131 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
402 | 316 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 70161 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |