FL H0291 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-4)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Health Care Regulation Policy (HFPC)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-4)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Health Care Regulation Policy (HFPC)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proscribes specified fee setting provisions in patient services contracts between health care practitioners & health insurers, prepaid limited health service organizations, or health maintenance organizations.
Title
Provider Contracts
Sponsors
Rep. Clay Ford [R] | Rep. Erik Fresen [R] | Sen. Alan Hays [R] | Rep. Edward Homan [R] |
Sen. Ed Hooper [R] | Rep. Mike Horner [R] | Rep. Matt Hudson [R] | Rep. Paige Kreegel [R] |
Rep. Peter Nehr [R] | Rep. Ari Porth [D] | Rep. William Proctor [R] | Rep. Ronald Renuart [R] |
Rep. Yolly Roberson [D] | Sen. Darryl Rouson [D] | Sen. Darren Soto [D] | Rep. John Tobia [R] |
Rep. Charles Van Zant [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Health Care Regulation Policy (HFPC) | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Health Care Regulation Policy (HFPC); Insurance, Business, & Financial Affairs Policy (GGPC); Government Operations Appropriations (CGHC); General Government Policy Council -HJ 00031 | |
2009-11-13 | Referred to Health Care Regulation Policy (HFPC); Insurance, Business, & Financial Affairs Policy (GGPC); Government Operations Appropriations (CGHC); General Government Policy Council | |
2009-11-02 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0302 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Commerce
H0715 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died pending review of CS
H0715 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died pending review of CS
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0627 | 6474 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0636 | 035 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0641 | 315 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |