FL H0715 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died pending review of CS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died pending review of CS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes insurers to offer voluntary wellness or health improvement programs that provide rewards or incentives; provides for medical verification for nonparticipation in such programs; provides that such rewards or incentives are not insurance benefits & do not constitute violation of unfair methods of competition & unfair or deceptive acts or practice provisions, etc.
Title
Health Services Claims
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died pending review of CS | |
2010-04-21 | CS read 1st time on 04/21/10 -HJ 00845; Pending review of CS under Rule 7.20 | |
2010-03-31 | CS by Health Care Regulation Policy (HFPC); YEAS 12 NAYS 1 -HJ 00851 | |
2010-03-29 | On Committee agenda-- Health Care Regulation Policy (HFPC), 03/31/10, 11:00 am, Morris Hall | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Health Care Regulation Policy (HFPC); Insurance, Business, & Financial Affairs Policy (GGPC); Government Operations Appropriations (CGHC); General Government Policy Council -HJ 00066 | |
2010-01-28 | Referred to Health Care Regulation Policy (HFPC); Insurance, Business, & Financial Affairs Policy (GGPC); Government Operations Appropriations (CGHC); General Government Policy Council | |
2010-01-19 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1232 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Commerce
H0291 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Health Care Regulation Policy (HFPC)
S0302 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Commerce
H1503 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Health Regulation, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5311 (Ch. 2010-161), CS/CS/SB 1412 (Ch. 2010-102)
H1143 (Similar To) 2010-07-19 - Veto Message received -HJ 00010; Veto Message referred to Rules and Calendar Council -HJ 00016
H0291 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Health Care Regulation Policy (HFPC)
S0302 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Commerce
H1503 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Health Regulation, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5311 (Ch. 2010-161), CS/CS/SB 1412 (Ch. 2010-102)
H1143 (Similar To) 2010-07-19 - Veto Message received -HJ 00010; Veto Message referred to Rules and Calendar Council -HJ 00016
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0626 | 9541 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0627 | 6141 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0627 | 6474 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0636 | 035 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0641 | 315 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0641 | 3156 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |