FL H0287 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 4 (Ch. 2013-38)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 4 (Ch. 2013-38)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expands public records & public meetings exemptions to include Commission on Ethics' determination & proceedings regarding written referral of alleged violation of code & breach of public trust submitted by certain enumerated officials; provides for duration of exemptions; provides for future legislative review & repeal; provides statement of public necessity.
Title
Pub. Rec. & Meetings/Commission on Ethics
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | House | Died in Ethics and Elections Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 4 (Ch. 2013-38) |
2013-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2013-01-30 | House | Referred to Ethics and Elections Subcommittee; Government Operations Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee |
2013-01-18 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0285 (Related) 2013-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 2 (Ch. 2013-36)
S0652 (Same As) 2013-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 4 (Ch. 2013-38)
H0381 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 4 (Ch. 2013-38)
H0233 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 2 (Ch. 2013-36)
H0297 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 4 (Ch. 2013-38)
H7133 (Similar To) 2013-04-24 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 4 (Ch. 2013-38), CS/SB 2 (Ch. 2013-36)
S0004 (Similar To) 2013-05-16 - Chapter No. 2013-38, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 2 (Ch. 2013-36)
S0926 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 2 (Ch. 2013-36)
S0652 (Same As) 2013-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 4 (Ch. 2013-38)
H0381 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 4 (Ch. 2013-38)
H0233 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 2 (Ch. 2013-36)
H0297 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 4 (Ch. 2013-38)
H7133 (Similar To) 2013-04-24 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 4 (Ch. 2013-38), CS/SB 2 (Ch. 2013-36)
S0004 (Similar To) 2013-05-16 - Chapter No. 2013-38, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 2 (Ch. 2013-36)
S0926 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 2 (Ch. 2013-36)
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/287 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0287/BillText/Filed/PDF |