FL H0233 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 2 (Ch. 2013-36)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 2 (Ch. 2013-36)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that disclosures be made in writing on forms prescribed by Commission on Ethics; provides that public officer may not act in way that suggests that officer can be improperly influenced while performing official duties; provides penalties if public official makes prohibited appointment, employment, promotion, or advancement decision; establishes criteria for qualified blind trusts for public officials; provides responsibilities of public officer when abstaining from vote; revises candidate's disclosure responsibilities for financial interests; defines "vendor"; prohibits reporting individual or procurement employee from soliciting or accepting gift in excess of certain value from vendor; requires reporting of certain gifts; increases civil penalties for violation of ch. 112, F.S.; establishes criminal penalties & attorney fees for certain violations; provides noncriminal infraction & fine for certain violations for persons required to register as lobbyist; provides procedures for investigation of complaints filed with commission.
Title
Governmental Ethics
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Fasano [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | House | Died in Ethics and Elections Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 2 (Ch. 2013-36) |
2013-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2013-01-30 | House | Referred to Ethics and Elections Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; State Affairs Committee |
2013-01-17 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0297 (Related) 2013-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 4 (Ch. 2013-38)
H0285 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 2 (Ch. 2013-36)
H0287 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 4 (Ch. 2013-38)
H0379 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 2 (Ch. 2013-36)
H7131 (Similar To) 2013-04-24 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 2 (Ch. 2013-36), CS/SB 4 (Ch. 2013-38)
S0002 (Similar To) 2013-05-02 - Chapter No. 2013-36, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 4 (Ch. 2013-38)
S0272 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 2 (Ch. 2013-36)
S0652 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 4 (Ch. 2013-38)
S0926 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 2 (Ch. 2013-36)
H0285 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 2 (Ch. 2013-36)
H0287 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 4 (Ch. 2013-38)
H0379 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 2 (Ch. 2013-36)
H7131 (Similar To) 2013-04-24 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 2 (Ch. 2013-36), CS/SB 4 (Ch. 2013-38)
S0002 (Similar To) 2013-05-02 - Chapter No. 2013-36, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 4 (Ch. 2013-38)
S0272 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 2 (Ch. 2013-36)
S0652 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 4 (Ch. 2013-38)
S0926 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 2 (Ch. 2013-36)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
112 | 312 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 313 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 3135 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 3142 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 3143 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 3144 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 3145 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 3148 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 3149 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 317 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 3215 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 324 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
310 | 151 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
411 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/233 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0233/BillText/Filed/PDF |