FL H0279 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Chapter No. 2020-154
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Chapter No. 2020-154
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revising disclosure requirements for bidding documents and other requests for proposals issued for bids by a local governmental entity and public contracts entered into between local governmental entities and contractors; requiring that a local government that performs projects using its own services, employees, and equipment provide a report to the local governing board with certain information, etc.
Title
Local Government Public Construction Works
Sponsors
House State Affairs Committee | House Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee | Rep. David Smith [R] | Rep. Juan Fernandez-Barquin [R] |
Rep. Anthony Sabatini [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#3 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#611 (Y: 114 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#611 (Y: 114 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-01 | Chapter No. 2020-154 | |
2020-06-30 | Approved by Governor | |
2020-06-17 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2020-03-12 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2020-03-12 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 36 NAYS 1 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Substituted for CS/CS/SB 504 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Withdrawn from Community Affairs; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Received |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2020-03-09 | Senate | In Messages |
2020-03-09 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 114 NAYS 1 |
2020-03-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-06 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-03-06 | House | Amendment(s) adopted (217229) 896 |
2020-03-06 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-03 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/20 |
2020-03-02 | House | CS/CS by State Affairs Committee read 1st time |
2020-03-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-28 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-02-27 | House | CS/CS by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 21 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-25 | House | On Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 02/27/20, 8:00 am, Morris Hall |
2020-02-04 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Favorable by Business and Professions Subcommittee; YEAS 8 NAYS 2 |
2020-01-31 | House | On Committee agenda-- Business and Professions Subcommittee, 02/04/20, 12:00 pm, Webster Hall |
2020-01-30 | House | Now in Business and Professions Subcommittee |
2020-01-29 | House | CS by Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee read 1st time |
2020-01-29 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-01-29 | House | CS by Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 3 |
2020-01-27 | House | On Committee agenda-- Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee, 01/29/20, 8:00 am, Morris Hall |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-10-14 | House | Referred to Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee; Business and Professions Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee |
2019-10-02 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S504 (Similar To) 2020-03-11 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 279
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
218 | 80 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
255 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
336 | 41 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |