FL H0271 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Requires boating safety education courses & temporary certificate examinations to include specified information; directs FWCC to include specified information in boating safety campaigns & education materials.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Boating Safety Education

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-01 - House - House Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-30HouseDied in Commerce Committee
2021-04-05HouseNow in Commerce Committee
2021-04-05HouseReferred to Commerce Committee
2021-04-05HouseOriginal reference removed: Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
2021-04-05House1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
2021-04-02HouseCS Filed
2021-04-02HouseLaid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
2021-04-02HouseReported out of Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2021-04-01HouseFavorable with CS by Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2021-03-30HousePCS added to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee agenda
2021-03-02House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2021-02-03HouseNow in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2021-02-03HouseReferred to Commerce Committee
2021-02-03HouseReferred to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
2021-02-03HouseReferred to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2021-01-15HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1658 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Environment and Natural Resources
H1451 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
327395Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback