FL S1658 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Environment and Natural Resources
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Citing this act as the "Limb Preservation Act"; prohibiting sitting in a specified manner upon the bow, transom, or gunwale of a power-driven vessel while the vessel is making way; prohibiting a power-driven vessel operator from allowing a person to sit in such a way; providing a noncriminal infraction for violations relating to power-driven vessel safety requirements, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Power-driven Vessel Safety Requirements

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-30SenateDied in Environment and Natural Resources
2021-03-10SenateIntroduced
2021-03-04SenateReferred to Environment and Natural Resources; Community Affairs; Rules
2021-02-24SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H271 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Commerce Committee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
327396Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32773Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback