FL H0263 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-14 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-82; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 971 (Ch. 2010-223)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Requires application form for motor vehicle registration or renewal of registration to include language permitting applicant to make voluntary contribution to Prevent Child Sexual Abuse; requires application form for original, renewal, or replacement driver's license or identification card to include language permitting applicant to make voluntary contribution to certain nonprofit organizations, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles [CPSC]

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-04-16 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0008 - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-23 - House - House Roll Call No. 0608 - Passage (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-05-14 Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-82; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 971 (Ch. 2010-223)
2010-04-30 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor -HJ 01700
2010-04-21 Ordered enrolled -HJ 00841
2010-04-16 Read 3rd time -SJ 00624; CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 -SJ 00624
2010-04-15 Withdrawn from Transportation; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Health and Human Services Appropriations -SJ 00589; Substituted for CS/SB 842 -SJ 00589; Read 2nd time -SJ 00589
2010-04-14 Received -SJ 00575; Referred to Transportation; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Health and Human Services Appropriations -SJ 00576
2010-03-24 In Messages
2010-03-23 Read 3rd time -HJ 00363; CS passed; YEAS 116 NAYS 0 -HJ 00364
2010-03-18 Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 00330
2010-03-03 Favorable by- Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 -HJ 00207; Placed on Calendar -HJ 00207
2010-03-02 Introduced, referred to Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA); Transportation & Economic Development Appropriations (CEED); Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00029; On Committee agenda-- Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA), 01/13/10, 9:00 am, 404-H; Favorable by Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA); YEAS 13 NAYS 0 -HJ 00165; Now in Transportation & Economic Development Appropriations (CEED) -HJ 00165; On Committee agenda-- Transportation & Economic Development Appropriations (CEED), 02/04/10, 9:15 am, Morris Hall; CS by Transportation & Economic Development Appropriations (CEED); YEAS 13 NAYS 0 -HJ 00168; CS read 1st time on 03/02/10 -HJ 00157; Pending review of CS under Rule 7.20; Now in Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00163; On Council agenda-- Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council, 03/03/10, 10:45 am, 404-H
2010-03-01 On Council agenda-- Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council, 03/03/10, 10:45 am, 404-H
2010-02-09 Now in Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council
2010-02-05 Pending review of CS under Rule 7.20
2010-02-04 CS by Transportation & Economic Development Appropriations (CEED); YEAS 13 NAYS 0
2010-01-28 On Committee agenda-- Transportation & Economic Development Appropriations (CEED), 02/04/10, 9:15 am, Morris Hall
2010-01-13 Favorable by Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA); YEAS 13 NAYS 0; Now in Transportation & Economic Development Appropriations (CEED)
2010-01-06 On Committee agenda-- Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA), 01/13/10, 9:00 am, 404-H
2009-11-13 Referred to Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA); Transportation & Economic Development Appropriations (CEED); Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council
2009-10-22 Filed

Same As/Similar To

S0842 (Similar To) 2010-04-15 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00589; Amendment(s) adopted (786328) -SJ 00589; Substituted CS/HB 263 -SJ 00589; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 263 (Ch. 2010-82), CS/CS/HB 971 (Ch. 2010-223) -SJ 00589
S2400 (Similar To) 2010-04-27 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00901; Amendment(s) adopted (816020, 562928, 540110, 469116, 468800, 343628, 160518) -SJ 00902; Substituted CS/CS/HB 971 -SJ 00902; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 971 (Ch. 2010-223), CS/HB 263 (Ch. 2010-82), CS/CS/CS/HB 631 (Ch. 2010-198), CS/HB 795 (Ch. 2010-107) -SJ 00902
H0971 (Similar To) 2010-06-07 - Chapter No. 2010-223; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 263 (Ch. 2010-82), CS/CS/CS/HB 631 (Ch. 2010-198), CS/HB 795 (Ch. 2010-107)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
032002Amended CodeSee Bill Text
032208Amended CodeSee Bill Text
032218Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback