FL S2400 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-27 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00901; Amendment(s) adopted (816020, 562928, 540110, 469116, 468800, 343628, 160518) -SJ 00902; Substituted CS/CS/HB 971 -SJ 00902; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 971 (Ch. 2010-223), CS/HB 263 (Ch. 2010-82), CS/CS/CS/HB 631 (Ch. 2010-198), CS/HB 795 (Ch. 2010-107) -SJ 00902
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes crash reports to be provided to law enforcement agencies and county traffic operations. Provides that certain tri-vehicles are hybrid vehicles. Revises qualifications for an immobilization agency to immobilize vehicles in a judicial circuit. Requires a lienholder who repossesses a motor vehicle in this state to apply for a certificate of repossession or certificate of title, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor Vehicles [CPSC]

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-27 Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00901; Amendment(s) adopted (816020, 562928, 540110, 469116, 468800, 343628, 160518) -SJ 00902; Substituted CS/CS/HB 971 -SJ 00902; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 971 (Ch. 2010-223), CS/HB 263 (Ch. 2010-82), CS/CS/CS/HB 631 (Ch. 2010-198), CS/HB 795 (Ch. 2010-107) -SJ 00902
2010-04-26 Placed on Special Order Calendar
2010-04-22 Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 00703
2010-04-21 Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2010-04-19 CS/CS/CS by- Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 -SJ 00703; CS read 1st time on 04/21/10 -SJ 00710
2010-04-16 Now in Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations -SJ 00600; On Committee agenda-- Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations, 04/19/10, 10:30 am, 309-C
2010-04-15 Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2010-04-13 CS/CS by Finance and Tax; YEAS 4 NAYS 1 -SJ 00600; CS read 1st time on 04/15/10 -SJ 00612
2010-04-08 Now in Finance and Tax -SJ 00523; On Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax, 04/13/10, 2:45 pm, 301-S
2010-04-07 Favorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 -SJ 00523
2010-04-01 On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 04/07/10, 2:00 pm, 37-S
2010-03-23 Now in Criminal Justice -SJ 00279
2010-03-19 Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2010-03-17 CS by Transportation; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 -SJ 00279; CS read 1st time on 03/22/10 -SJ 00297
2010-03-12 On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 03/17/10, 1:00 pm, 37-S
2010-03-11 Introduced -SJ 00205
2010-03-04 Referred to Transportation; Criminal Justice; Finance and Tax; Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations -SJ 00205
2010-02-25 Filed

Same As/Similar To

H0631 (Similar To) 2010-06-03 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-198; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 971 (Ch. 2010-223)
H0801 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Full Appropriations Council on Education & Economic Development
H0971 (Similar To) 2010-06-07 - Chapter No. 2010-223; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 263 (Ch. 2010-82), CS/CS/CS/HB 631 (Ch. 2010-198), CS/HB 795 (Ch. 2010-107)
S0482 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 631 (Ch. 2010-198), CS/CS/HB 971 (Ch. 2010-223)
S1182 (Similar To) 2010-04-29 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 01132; Amendment(s) adopted (132198) -SJ 01132; Substituted CS/CS/CS/HB 631 -SJ 01132; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 631 (Ch. 2010-198), CS/CS/HB 971 (Ch. 2010-223) -SJ 01132
H1447 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Insurance, Business, & Financial Affairs Policy (GGPC), companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/CS/HB 663 (Ch. 2010-176), CS/CS/SB 1736 (Ch. 2010-90)
H0795 (Similar To) 2010-05-27 - Chapter No. 2010-107; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 971 (Ch. 2010-223)
S1604 (Similar To) 2010-04-27 - Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 00703; Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00899; Was taken up -SJ 00917; Substituted CS/HB 795 -SJ 00917; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 795 (Ch. 2010-107), CS/CS/HB 971 (Ch. 2010-223) -SJ 00917
S0432 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Criminal Justice, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 971 (Ch. 2010-223)
H0263 (Similar To) 2010-05-14 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-82; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 971 (Ch. 2010-223)
S0842 (Similar To) 2010-04-15 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00589; Amendment(s) adopted (786328) -SJ 00589; Substituted CS/HB 263 -SJ 00589; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 263 (Ch. 2010-82), CS/CS/HB 971 (Ch. 2010-223) -SJ 00589
S1478 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 971 (Ch. 2010-223)
S1522 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 351 (Ch. 2010-168), CS/CS/HB 971 (Ch. 2010-223)
S2226 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 631 (Ch. 2010-198), CS/CS/HB 971 (Ch. 2010-223)
S2638 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Higher Education, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 971 (Ch. 2010-223)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
026103Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0316003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0316066Amended CodeSee Bill Text
03160741Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0316159Amended CodeSee Bill Text
03161923Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0316193Amended CodeSee Bill Text
03161935Amended CodeSee Bill Text
03162065Amended CodeSee Bill Text
03162085Amended CodeSee Bill Text
03162122Amended CodeSee Bill Text
03162124Amended CodeSee Bill Text
031621265Amended CodeSee Bill Text
03162952Amended CodeSee Bill Text
031629545Amended CodeSee Bill Text
03163026Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0316545Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0316550Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0316605Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0316646Amended CodeSee Bill Text
03170003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
031814Amended CodeSee Bill Text
031818Amended CodeSee Bill Text
031819Amended CodeSee Bill Text
031914Amended CodeSee Bill Text
031928Amended CodeSee Bill Text
031930Amended CodeSee Bill Text
032001Amended CodeSee Bill Text
032002Amended CodeSee Bill Text
032003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
032005Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0320055Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0320071Amended CodeSee Bill Text
03200715Amended CodeSee Bill Text
032008Amended CodeSee Bill Text
032008053Amended CodeSee Bill Text
032008056Amended CodeSee Bill Text
03200807Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0320084Amended CodeSee Bill Text
03200847Amended CodeSee Bill Text
03200863Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0320131Amended CodeSee Bill Text
032027Amended CodeSee Bill Text
032077Amended CodeSee Bill Text
03208225Amended CodeSee Bill Text
032103Amended CodeSee Bill Text
032105Amended CodeSee Bill Text
032201Amended CodeSee Bill Text
03220261Amended CodeSee Bill Text
032208Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0322095Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0322121Amended CodeSee Bill Text
032218Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0322212Amended CodeSee Bill Text
032222Amended CodeSee Bill Text
03222615Amended CodeSee Bill Text
032227Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0322271Amended CodeSee Bill Text
032228Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0322282Amended CodeSee Bill Text
032234Amended CodeSee Bill Text
032261Amended CodeSee Bill Text
032772Amended CodeSee Bill Text
048806Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback