FL H0239 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 19 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-11-08 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 19 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-11-08 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes production of certain letter by surviving spouses of veterans to property appraisers.
Title
Property Tax Exemption for Surviving Spouses of Veterans
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-11-08 | House | Withdrawn prior to introduction |
2023-11-02 | House | Now in Ways & Means Committee |
2023-11-02 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2023-11-02 | House | Referred to Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee |
2023-11-02 | House | Referred to Ways & Means Committee |
2023-10-19 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S218 (Same As) 2024-03-08 - Died in Community Affairs
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/239 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/239/BillText/Filed/PDF |