FL H0235 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on March 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-28 - Chapter No. 2022-20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on March 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-28 - Chapter No. 2022-20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits school personnel from using mechanical restraint on students with disabilities.
Title
Restraint of Students with Disabilities in Public Schools
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#16 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#665 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House Education & Employment Committee (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - House - House Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-13 - House - House Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#665 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House Education & Employment Committee (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - House - House Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-13 - House - House Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-28 | Chapter No. 2022-20 | |
2022-03-25 | Approved by Governor | |
2022-03-22 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2022-03-04 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2022-03-04 | House | In Messages |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Substituted for SB 390 |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Withdrawn from Appropriations |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Received |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2022-03-02 | Senate | In Messages |
2022-03-02 | House | Passed; YEAS 115, NAYS 0 |
2022-03-02 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-01 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2022-03-01 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2022-03-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-24 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/1/2022) |
2022-02-01 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2022-02-01 | House | Bill released to House Calendar |
2022-02-01 | House | Reported out of Education & Employment Committee |
2022-02-01 | House | Favorable by Education & Employment Committee |
2022-01-28 | House | Added to Education & Employment Committee agenda |
2022-01-27 | House | Now in Education & Employment Committee |
2022-01-27 | House | Reported out of Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee |
2022-01-27 | House | Favorable by Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee |
2022-01-25 | House | Added to Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee agenda |
2022-01-13 | House | Now in Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee |
2022-01-13 | House | Reported out of Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee |
2022-01-13 | House | Favorable by Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2022-01-11 | House | Added to Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee agenda |
2021-10-22 | House | Now in Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee |
2021-10-22 | House | Referred to Education & Employment Committee |
2021-10-22 | House | Referred to Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee |
2021-10-22 | House | Referred to Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee |
2021-10-06 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S390 (Same As) 2022-03-04 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 235