FL S0390 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on October 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-04 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 235
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-04 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 235
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting school personnel from using mechanical restraint on students with disabilities; providing exceptions, etc.
Title
Restraint of Students with Disabilities in Public Schools
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Subcommittee on Education (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate Education (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Subcommittee on Education (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate Education (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | Senate | Laid on Table, refer to HB 235 |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Substituted HB 235 |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/04/22 |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 20 NAYS 0 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/28/22, 10:30 am, 412 Knott Building |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2022-02-11 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Education, 02/16/22, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Favorable by Education; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2022-01-27 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Education, 02/01/22, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-10-13 | Senate | Referred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations |
2021-10-01 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H235 (Same As) 2022-03-28 - Chapter No. 2022-20