FL H0233 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on June 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-23 - Chapter No. 2021-159
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on June 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-23 - Chapter No. 2021-159
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits State Board of Education and BOG from shielding students, staff, and faculty from certain speech; requires State Board of Education to conduct annual assessment on intellectual freedom & viewpoint diversity; creates a cause of action for recording or publication of certain video or audio recordings; revises provisions related to protected expressive activity, university student governments, & codes of conduct.
Title
Postsecondary Education
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#13 (Y: 23 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#14 (Y: 77 N: 42 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - House Education & Employment Committee (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House Post-Secondary Education & Lifelong Learning Subcommittee (Y: 12 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#14 (Y: 77 N: 42 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - House Education & Employment Committee (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House Post-Secondary Education & Lifelong Learning Subcommittee (Y: 12 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-23 | Chapter No. 2021-159 | |
2021-06-22 | Approved by Governor | |
2021-06-11 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2021-04-07 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2021-04-07 | House | In Messages |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Immediately certified |
2021-04-07 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 23 NAYS 15 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Substituted for CS/CS/SB 264 |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Withdrawn from Appropriations |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Received |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2021-03-25 | House | Message sent to senate |
2021-03-25 | Senate | In Messages |
2021-03-18 | House | CS passed; YEAS 77, NAYS 42 |
2021-03-18 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-03-18 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-03-11 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/18/2021) |
2021-03-11 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2021-03-11 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2021-03-10 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2) |
2021-03-10 | House | CS Filed |
2021-03-10 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2021-03-10 | House | Reported out of Education & Employment Committee |
2021-03-10 | House | Favorable with CS by Education & Employment Committee |
2021-03-08 | House | Added to Education & Employment Committee agenda |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-02-23 | House | Now in Education & Employment Committee |
2021-02-23 | House | Referred to Education & Employment Committee |
2021-02-23 | House | Original reference removed: Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-02-19 | House | CS Filed |
2021-02-19 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2021-02-19 | House | Reported out of Post-Secondary Education & Lifelong Learning Subcommittee |
2021-02-17 | House | Favorable with CS by Post-Secondary Education & Lifelong Learning Subcommittee |
2021-02-10 | House | PCS added to Post-Secondary Education & Lifelong Learning Subcommittee agenda |
2021-01-22 | House | Referred to Post-Secondary Education and Lifelong Learning Subcommittee; Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee; Education and Employment Committee |
2021-01-13 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S264 (Same As) 2021-04-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 233 (Ch. 2021-159)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1001 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1001 | 706 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1004 | 097 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1004 | 26 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1006 | 60 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |