FL H0233 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-02 - Ordered enrolled -HJ 1059
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-02 - Ordered enrolled -HJ 1059
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that probation supervision services for defendants found guilty of certain misdemeanor controlled substance offenses may be provided by licensed substance abuse education & intervention programs; authorizes certain entities providing probation services to provide licensed substance abuse education & intervention programs; requires private entities providing such programs to contract with county & comply with other applicable provisions.
Title
Substance Abuse Education and Intervention Programs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#10 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#992 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#992 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-02 | Ordered enrolled -HJ 1059 | |
2012-03-02 | CS passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 -SJ 769 | |
2012-03-02 | Read 3rd time -SJ 769 | |
2012-03-01 | Placed on 3rd reading | |
2012-03-01 | Withdrawn from Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Budget Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations; Budget -SJ 731 | |
2012-02-29 | Referred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Budget Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations; Budget | |
2012-02-29 | In Messages | |
2012-02-29 | CS passed as amended; YEAS 117 NAYS 0 -HJ 953 | |
2012-02-29 | Read 3rd time -HJ 952 | |
2012-02-28 | Placed on 3rd reading | |
2012-02-28 | Read 2nd time -HJ 898 | |
2012-02-24 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/28/12 | |
2012-02-23 | CS/CS by Judiciary Committee read 1st time -HJ 796 | |
2012-02-23 | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2012-02-22 | CS/CS by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 1 -HJ 814 | |
2012-02-20 | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 02/22/12, 8:00 am, 404 HOB | |
2012-02-14 | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 02/16/12, 11:30 am, 404 HOB --Not considered | |
2012-01-17 | CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee read 1st time -HJ 220 | |
2012-01-17 | Original reference(s) removed: Justice Appropriations Subcommittee | |
2012-01-13 | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2012-01-12 | CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 -HJ 227 | |
2012-01-10 | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 01/12/12, 8:30 am, 404 HOB | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -HJ 25 | |
2011-10-17 | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee -HJ 25 | |
2011-09-28 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
948 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
948 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |