FL H0223 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Exempts fantasy contests from certain regulations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fantasy Contests

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10HouseDied in Ways and Means Committee
2018-03-10HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-23HouseNow in Ways and Means Committee
2018-01-23HouseFavorable by Tourism and Gaming Control Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
2018-01-19HouseOn Committee agenda-- Tourism and Gaming Control Subcommittee, 01/23/18, 3:30 pm, Webster Hall
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2017-10-12HouseReferred to Tourism and Gaming Control Subcommittee; Ways and Means Committee; Commerce Committee
2017-10-03HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S374 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
S840 (Similar To) 2018-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 7067

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
54613Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback