FL H0223 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-08 - See HB 7109
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides certain exemptions from tax imposed on rental or license fees charged for use of commercial real property; provides for future repeal of tax.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tax on Commercial Real Property

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-08HouseSee HB 7109
2017-05-05HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2017-03-07HouseIntroduced
2017-01-23HouseReferred to Ways and Means Committee; Appropriations Committee
2017-01-11HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S0838 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Commerce and Tourism

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
212031Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2120598Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2120602Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2881258Amended CodeSee Bill Text
338234Amended CodeSee Bill Text
341840Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback