FL H0215 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-02 - Chapter No. 2018-130
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing a mobile carrier to be operated on sidewalks and crosswalks within a county or municipality when such use is permissible under federal law; requiring safety belt or, if applicable, child restraint usage by an operator or passenger of an autocycle; providing that a mobile carrier is not required to satisfy specified registration and insurance requirements; authorizing a person to operate an autocycle without a motorcycle endorsement, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor Vehicles

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#901 (Y: 91 N: 10 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#39 (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#532 (Y: 105 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-02 Chapter No. 2018-130
2018-03-30 Approved by Governor
2018-03-26 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2018-03-09HouseOrdered engrossed, then enrolled
2018-03-09HousePassed as amended; YEAS 91 NAYS 10
2018-03-09HouseConcurred in 2 amendment(s) (269940, 622474) 1185
2018-03-09HouseIn returning messages
2018-03-09SenatePassed as amended; YEAS 33 NAYS 3
2018-03-09SenateAmendment(s) reconsidered, adopted as amended (622474)
2018-03-09SenateRead 3rd time
2018-03-08SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-03-08SenateAmendment(s) adopted (622474)
2018-03-08SenateRead 2nd time
2018-03-08SenateSubstituted for CS/SB 504
2018-03-08SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-03-08SenateWithdrawn from Transportation; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
2018-02-01SenateReceived
2018-02-01SenateReferred to Transportation; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
2018-01-31SenateIn Messages
2018-01-25HousePassed; YEAS 105 NAYS 1
2018-01-25HouseRead 3rd time
2018-01-24HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-01-24HouseRead 2nd time
2018-01-18HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 01/24/18
2018-01-11HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-01-11HouseFavorable by- Government Accountability Committee; YEAS 19 NAYS 2
2018-01-09HouseOn Committee agenda-- Government Accountability Committee, 01/11/18, 10:30 am, Morris Hall
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2017-11-15HouseNow in Government Accountability Committee
2017-11-15HouseFavorable by Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 1
2017-11-08HouseOn Committee agenda-- Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee, 11/15/17, 8:30 am, 116 Knott Building
2017-10-25HouseNow in Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
2017-10-25HouseFavorable by Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 2
2017-10-18HouseOn Committee agenda-- Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee, 10/25/17, 4:00 pm, Reed Hall
2017-10-12HouseReferred to Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; Government Accountability Committee
2017-10-02HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S504 (Similar To) 2018-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 215
H883 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Messages
H909 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
H1287 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Transportation
S1104 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Messages

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
21205Amended CodeSee Bill Text
316003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
316008Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3162071Amended CodeSee Bill Text
316303Amended CodeSee Bill Text
316614Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32001Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32002Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32008Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32203Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32212Amended CodeSee Bill Text
324021Amended CodeSee Bill Text
334352Amended CodeSee Bill Text
403415Amended CodeSee Bill Text
655960Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/215
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/215/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/215/BillText/e1/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/215/BillText/er/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/215/Amendment/622474/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/215/Amendment/533092/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/215/Amendment/922342/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/215/Amendment/269940/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/215/Amendment/450108/HTML
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/215/Vote/HouseVote_h00215__532.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/215/Vote/SenateVote_h00215__039.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/215/Vote/HouseVote_h00215__901.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback