CA AB3034 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-22 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 66025.5 to the Education Code, relating to public postsecondary education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public postsecondary education: waiver of tuition and fees: California Conservation Corps.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-08-29 - Assembly - AB 3034 Low Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-08-28 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB3034 Low By Wilk (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-08-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-08-05 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Assembly - AB 3034 Low Assembly Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-09-22AssemblyVetoed by Governor.
2024-09-11 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2024-08-29AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 0.).
2024-08-29AssemblyAssembly Rule 77 suspended.
2024-08-28AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2024-08-28SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 1.).
2024-08-26SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2024-08-23SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2024-08-19SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2024-08-15SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2024-08-15SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 15).
2024-08-05SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR suspense file.
2024-06-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2024-06-06SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
2024-05-29SenateReferred to Com. on ED.
2024-05-22SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2024-05-21AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 5383.)
2024-05-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2024-05-16AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2024-05-16AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (May 16).
2024-05-16AssemblyAssembly Rule 63 suspended.
2024-05-08AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2024-04-24AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2024-03-20AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2024-03-19AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
2024-03-18AssemblyReferred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2024-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
2024-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code66025.5New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240AB3034
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240AB3034#99INT
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240AB3034#98AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240AB3034#97AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240AB3034#96AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240AB3034#95AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240AB3034#94AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240AB3034#93ENR
Roll Callhttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billVotesClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240AB3034

Bill Comments

feedback