FL H0197 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - Chapter No. 2022-112
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - Chapter No. 2022-112
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides exemption from public records requirements for nonjudicial record of arrest of minor who has successfully completed diversion program; provides for retroactive application; provides for future legislative review & repeal of exemption; provides statement of public necessity.
Title
Pub. Rec./Nonjudicial Arrest Record of a Minor
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#5 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#580 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House Judiciary Committee (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - House - House Government Operations Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-12 - House - House Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#580 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House Judiciary Committee (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - House - House Government Operations Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-12 - House - House Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | Chapter No. 2022-112 | |
2022-05-12 | Approved by Governor | |
2022-05-05 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2022-03-08 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2022-03-08 | House | In Messages |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Substituted for CS/SB 344 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Withdrawn from Appropriations |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Received |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2022-02-24 | Senate | In Messages |
2022-02-24 | House | Immediately certified |
2022-02-24 | House | Passed; YEAS 115, NAYS 0 |
2022-02-24 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-02-22 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2022-02-22 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2022-02-22 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-17 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/22/2022) |
2022-02-01 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2022-02-01 | House | Bill released to House Calendar |
2022-02-01 | House | Reported out of Judiciary Committee |
2022-02-01 | House | Favorable by Judiciary Committee |
2022-01-28 | House | Added to Judiciary Committee agenda |
2022-01-27 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2022-01-27 | House | Reported out of Government Operations Subcommittee |
2022-01-27 | House | Favorable by Government Operations Subcommittee |
2022-01-25 | House | Added to Government Operations Subcommittee agenda |
2022-01-12 | House | Now in Government Operations Subcommittee |
2022-01-12 | House | Reported out of Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2022-01-12 | House | Favorable by Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2022-01-10 | House | Added to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee agenda |
2021-10-06 | House | Now in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2021-10-06 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2021-10-06 | House | Referred to Government Operations Subcommittee |
2021-10-06 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2021-09-24 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H195 (Related) 2022-05-12 - Chapter No. 2022-111
S344 (Same As) 2022-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 197
S342 (Similar To) 2022-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 195
S344 (Same As) 2022-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 197
S342 (Similar To) 2022-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 195