FL H0195 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-7-1)
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - Chapter No. 2022-111
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requires FDLE to expunge nonjudicial arrest record of minors who successfully complete diversion program for specified felony offenses, rather than only for misdemeanor offenses; authorizes minor who successfully completes diversion program & is granted expunction for any covered offense to lawfully deny or fail to acknowledge certain information.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Juvenile Diversion Program Expunction

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#4 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#579 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House Judiciary Committee (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House Justice Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-12 - House - House Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-05-12 Chapter No. 2022-111
2022-05-12 Approved by Governor
2022-05-05 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2022-03-08HouseOrdered enrolled
2022-03-08HouseIn Messages
2022-03-08SenateCS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
2022-03-08SenateRead 3rd time
2022-03-08SenateRead 2nd time
2022-03-08SenateSubstituted for CS/SB 342
2022-03-08SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2022-03-08SenateWithdrawn from Appropriations
2022-02-28SenateReceived
2022-02-24SenateReferred to Appropriations
2022-02-24SenateIn Messages
2022-02-24HouseImmediately certified
2022-02-24HouseCS passed; YEAS 115, NAYS 0
2022-02-24HouseRead 3rd time
2022-02-22HouseAdded to Third Reading Calendar
2022-02-22HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2022-02-22HouseRead 2nd time
2022-02-17HouseBill added to Special Order Calendar (2/22/2022)
2022-02-01HouseAdded to Second Reading Calendar
2022-02-01HouseBill released to House Calendar
2022-02-01HouseReported out of Judiciary Committee
2022-02-01HouseFavorable by Judiciary Committee
2022-01-28HouseAdded to Judiciary Committee agenda
2022-01-25HouseNow in Judiciary Committee
2022-01-25HouseReported out of Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
2022-01-25HouseFavorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
2022-01-21HouseAdded to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
2022-01-13House1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
2022-01-13HouseNow in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
2022-01-13HouseReferred to Judiciary Committee
2022-01-13HouseReferred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
2022-01-12HouseCS Filed
2022-01-12HouseLaid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
2022-01-12HouseReported out of Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
2022-01-12HouseFavorable with CS by Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
2022-01-11House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2022-01-10HousePCS added to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee agenda
2021-10-06HouseNow in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
2021-10-06HouseReferred to Judiciary Committee
2021-10-06HouseReferred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-10-06HouseReferred to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
2021-09-24HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H197 (Related) 2022-05-12 - Chapter No. 2022-112
S342 (Same As) 2022-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 195
S344 (Similar To) 2022-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 197

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
9430582Amended CodeSee Bill Text
985126Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/195
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/195/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/195/BillText/c1/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/195/BillText/er/PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/195/Analyses/h0195.CRM.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/195/Analyses/h0195a.JUA.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/195/Analyses/h0195b.JUA.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/195/Analyses/h0195c.JDC.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/195/Analyses/h0195d.JDC.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/195/Analyses/h0195z.CRM.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/195/Analyses/h0195z1.CRM.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=61380&IsPCB=1&BillId=73274
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=63305&IsPCB=0&BillId=73274
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=64124&IsPCB=0&BillId=73274
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/195/Vote/HouseVote_h00195c1579.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/195/Vote/SenateVote_h00195c1004.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback