FL H0191 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 69-42)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-13 - Signed by Officers and filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Urges Congress to encourage Government of Turkey to grant Ecumenical Patriarch appropriate international recognition, ecclesiastical succession, & right to train clergy of all nationalities & to respect property rights & human rights of Ecumenical Patriarchate.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ecumenical Patriarchate [SPSC]

Sponsors

Rep. Joseph Abruzzo [D]Rep. Sandra Adams [R]Rep. Kevin Ambler [R]Rep. Thomas Anderson [R]
Rep. Gary Aubuchon [R]Rep. Leonard Bembry [D]Sen. Ellyn Bogdanoff [R]Rep. Esteban Bovo [R]
Rep. Debbie Boyd [D]Rep. Mary Brandenburg [D]Sen. Oscar Braynon [D]Rep. Ronald Brise [D]
Sen. Dwight Bullard [D]Rep. Rachel Burgin [R]Rep. James Bush [D]Rep. Dean Cannon [R]
Rep. Jennifer Carroll [R]Rep. Charles Chestnut [D]Rep. Gwyndolen Clarke-Reed [D]Rep. Marti Coley [R]
Rep. Steve Crisafulli [R]Sen. Janet Cruz [D]Rep. Carl Domino [R]Rep. Chris Dorworth [R]
Rep. Brad Drake [R]Rep. Eric Eisnaugle [R]Sen. Greg Evers [R]Rep. Adam Fetterman [D]
Rep. Keith Fitzgerald [D]Sen. Anitere Flores [R]Rep. Clay Ford [R]Rep. James Frishe [R]
Rep. Matt Gaetz [R]Sen. Bill Galvano [R]Rep. Luis Garcia [D]Rep. Joseph Gibbons [D]
Sen. Audrey Gibson [D]Rep. Richard Glorioso [R]Rep. Eduardo Gonzalez [R]Rep. Tom Grady [R]
Sen. Denise Grimsley [R]Rep. Adam Hasner [R]Sen. Alan Hays [R]Rep. Bill Heller [D]
Rep. Doug Holder [R]Rep. Edward Homan [R]Sen. Ed Hooper [R]Rep. Mike Horner [R]
Rep. Matt Hudson [R]Sen. Dorothy Hukill [R]Rep. Evan Jenne [D]Rep. Mia Jones [D]
Rep. Kurt Kelly [R]Rep. Martin Kiar [D]Rep. Paige Kreegel [R]Sen. John Legg [R]
Rep. Marcelo Llorente [R]Rep. Janet Long [D]Rep. Carlos Lopez-Cantera [R]Sen. Debbie Mayfield [R]
Rep. Charles McBurney [R]Rep. Seth McKeel [R]Rep. Dave Murzin [R]Rep. Peter Nehr [R]
Rep. Bryan Nelson [R]Rep. Mark Pafford [D]Rep. Jimmy Patronis [R]Rep. Pat Patterson [R]
Rep. Scott Plakon [R]Rep. Juan-carlos Planas [R]Rep. Ralph Poppell [R]Rep. Ari Porth [D]
Rep. Stephen Precourt [R]Rep. William Proctor [R]Sen. Kevin Rader [D]Rep. Scott Randolph [D]
Rep. Lake Ray [R]Rep. Ron Reagan [R]Rep. Betty Reed [D]Rep. Michelle Rehwinkel Vasilinda [D]
Rep. David Rivera [R]Rep. Julio Robaina [R]Rep. Kenneth Roberson [R]Rep. Yolly Roberson [D]
Rep. Hazelle Rogers [D]Sen. Darryl Rouson [D]Sen. Maria Sachs [D]Rep. Franklin Sands [D]
Rep. Ron Saunders [D]Rep. Robert Schenck [R]Rep. Ron Schultz [R]Rep. Elaine Schwartz [D]
Rep. Kelly Skidmore [D]Sen. Darren Soto [D]Sen. Kelli Stargel [R]Rep. Richard Steinberg [D]
Rep. Dwayne Taylor [D]Rep. Geraldine Thompson [D]Rep. Nicholas Thompson [R]Sen. Perry Thurston [D]
Rep. John Tobia [R]Rep. Baxter Troutman [R]Rep. Charles Van Zant [R]Rep. James Waldman [D]
Rep. Will Weatherford [R]Rep. Michael Weinstein [R]Rep. Alan Williams [D]Rep. Trudi Williams [R]
Rep. John Wood [R]Rep. Ritch Workman [R]Rep. Juan Zapata [R]

Roll Calls

2010-04-23 - House - House Roll Call No. 0916 - Cosponsor (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-05-13 Signed by Officers and filed with Secretary of State
2010-04-28 Ordered enrolled -HJ 01284
2010-04-28 Withdrawn from Judiciary -SJ 00955; Substituted for SM 314 -SJ 00956; Read 2nd time -SJ 00955; CS adopted -SJ 00956
2010-04-26 Received -SJ 00880; Referred to Judiciary -SJ 00880
2010-04-23 In Messages
2010-04-23 Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 01009; CS adopted -HJ 01009
2010-04-09 Favorable by- Policy Council; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 -HJ 00662; Placed on Calendar -HJ 00662
2010-04-07 On Council agenda-- Policy Council, 04/09/10, 9:30 am, Morris Hall
2010-03-25 Now in Policy Council -HJ 00406
2010-03-24 CS read 1st time on 03/24/10 -HJ 00394; Pending review of CS under Rule 7.20
2010-03-23 CS by Rules and Calendar Council; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 -HJ 00397
2010-03-19 On Council agenda-- Rules and Calendar Council, 03/23/10, 6:30 pm or 15 minutes upon adjournment of the Full Appropriations Council on Education and Economic Development, 404-H
2010-03-02 Introduced, referred to Rules and Calendar Council; Policy Council -HJ 00024
2009-11-01 Referred to Rules and Calendar Council; Policy Council
2009-10-07 Filed

Same As/Similar To

S0314 (Similar To) 2010-04-28 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00955; Amendment(s) adopted (869980, 242254) -SJ 00955; Substituted CS/HM 191 -SJ 00955; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HM 191 (Adopted) -SJ 00955

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback