FL S0314 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on October 5 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-28 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00955; Amendment(s) adopted (869980, 242254) -SJ 00955; Substituted CS/HM 191 -SJ 00955; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HM 191 (Adopted) -SJ 00955
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 5 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-28 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00955; Amendment(s) adopted (869980, 242254) -SJ 00955; Substituted CS/HM 191 -SJ 00955; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HM 191 (Adopted) -SJ 00955
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the Congress of the United States to encourage the Government of Turkey to grant the Ecumenical Patriarch appropriate international recognition, ecclesiastical succession, and the right to train clergy of all nationalities and to respect the property rights and human rights of the Ecumenical Patriarchate.
Title
Ecumenical Patriarchate/Government of Turkey [SPSC]
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00955; Amendment(s) adopted (869980, 242254) -SJ 00955; Substituted CS/HM 191 -SJ 00955; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HM 191 (Adopted) -SJ 00955 | |
2010-04-21 | Withdrawn from Rules -SJ 00702; Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Judiciary; Rules -SJ 00031; On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 02/03/10, 10:00 am, 110-S; Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 -SJ 00163; Now in Rules -SJ 00163 | |
2010-02-03 | Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 8 NAYS 0; Now in Rules | |
2010-01-22 | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 02/03/10, 10:00 am, 110-S | |
2009-12-09 | Referred to Judiciary; Rules | |
2009-10-05 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0191 (Similar To) 2010-05-13 - Signed by Officers and filed with Secretary of State