FL H0189 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes certain courts to order criminal justice agencies to expunge criminal history record of individual with qualified cannabis offense; authorizes petition for such expunction at any time; requires that criminal justice agency that has custody of any criminal history record ordered expunged physically destroy or obliterate record; provides for effect of expunged records.
Title
Expunction of Criminal History Records Relating to Cannabis Offenses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-01-22 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2021-01-08 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H191 (Related) 2021-04-30 - Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
S468 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Messages
S470 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Messages
H343 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
S710 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Health Policy
S1916 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Regulated Industries
H1597 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
S468 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Messages
S470 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Messages
H343 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
S710 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Health Policy
S1916 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Regulated Industries
H1597 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/189 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/189/BillText/Filed/PDF |