FL H0157 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires county & municipal governments to adopt & enforce Model Ordinance for Florida-Friendly Fertilizer Use on Urban Landscapes; specifies that county & municipal governments must require use of specified slow-release fertilizers; provides additional requirements for counties & municipalities within estuary runoff areas; authorizes county & municipal governments to adopt additional standards if certain criteria are met.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fertilizers

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03HouseDied in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
2019-05-03HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-01-09HouseReferred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee; Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee
2019-01-02HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1716 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Agriculture

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4039336Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4039337Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback