FL H0157 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on June 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-17 - Chapter No. 2015-166
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Defines "business entity"; provides for restitution for certain out-of-pocket costs of victims; requires business entities to provide copies of business records of fraudulent transactions involving identity theft to victims & law enforcement agencies in certain circumstances; provides exception; includes counties & other political subdivisions in provisions prohibiting false marking of goods or packaging with location of origin; prohibits fraudulent issuance of indicia of membership interest in limited liability company; specifies that electronic statements are included in provisions prohibiting certain false representations; prohibits sale of counterfeit security company signs or decals; increases criminal penalties for fraudulently obtaining goods or services from health care provider; expands specified identity theft offenses to include all persons rather than being limited to natural persons; prohibits knowingly providing false information that becomes part of public record to facilitate or further commission of certain offenses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fraud

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#14 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#105 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-17 Chapter No. 2015-166
2015-06-16 Approved by Governor
2015-06-11 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2015-04-24HouseOrdered enrolled
2015-04-24SenateCS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
2015-04-24SenateRead 3rd time
2015-04-23SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2015-04-23SenateRead 2nd time
2015-04-23SenateSubstituted for CS/CS/CS/SB 390
2015-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2015-04-23SenateWithdrawn from Judiciary; Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Fiscal Policy
2015-04-21SenateReceived
2015-04-15SenateReferred to Judiciary; Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Fiscal Policy
2015-04-15SenateIn Messages
2015-04-09HouseCS passed; YEAS 115 NAYS 0
2015-04-09HouseRead 3rd time
2015-04-08HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2015-04-08HouseRead 2nd time
2015-04-06HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/08/15
2015-03-16HousePlaced on Calendar
2015-03-13HouseCS/CS/CS by Judiciary Committee read 1st time
2015-03-13HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c)
2015-03-11HouseCS/CS/CS by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
2015-03-09HouseOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 03/11/15, 1:00 pm, Sumner Hall
2015-03-08HouseNow in Judiciary Committee
2015-03-05HouseCS/CS by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee read 1st time
2015-03-05HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
2015-03-03HouseCS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee read 1st time
2015-03-03HouseCS/CS by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
2015-03-03HouseIntroduced
2015-02-27HouseOn Committee agenda-- Justice Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/03/15, 4:30 pm, Morris Hall
2015-02-11HouseNow in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
2015-02-05HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
2015-02-03HouseCS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2015-01-27HouseOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 02/03/15, 4:00 pm, Sumner Hall
2015-01-08HouseReferred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
2014-12-29HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S0390 (Similar To) 2015-04-23 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 157 (Ch. 2015-166)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
817011Amended CodeSee Bill Text
81702Amended CodeSee Bill Text
817032Amended CodeSee Bill Text
81711Amended CodeSee Bill Text
81712Amended CodeSee Bill Text
81713Amended CodeSee Bill Text
81714Amended CodeSee Bill Text
81715Amended CodeSee Bill Text
81717Amended CodeSee Bill Text
81718Amended CodeSee Bill Text
81719Amended CodeSee Bill Text
81739Amended CodeSee Bill Text
81740Amended CodeSee Bill Text
817411Amended CodeSee Bill Text
817412Amended CodeSee Bill Text
817414Amended CodeSee Bill Text
817481Amended CodeSee Bill Text
81750Amended CodeSee Bill Text
817568Amended CodeSee Bill Text
817569Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9210022Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/157
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0157/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0157/BillText/c1/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0157/BillText/c2/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0157/BillText/c3/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0157/BillText/er/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0157/Amendment/982691/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0157/Amendment/933091/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0157/Amendment/941675/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0157/Amendment/903177/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0157/Amendment/209445/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0157/Amendment/899797/PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0157/Vote/HouseVote_h0157c3105.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0157/Vote/SenateVote_h0157c3014.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback