FL S0390 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-23 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 157 (Ch. 2015-166)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Providing that causing damage to a victim's credit history or credit rating or otherwise causing harm to the victim in the course of falsely personating the victim is punishable; requiring business entities to provide copies of business records of fraudulent transactions involving identity theft to victims and law enforcement agencies in certain circumstances; prohibiting the sale of counterfeit security company signs or decals; expanding specified identity theft offenses to include all persons rather than being limited to natural persons, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fraud

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-23SenateLaid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 157 (Ch. 2015-166)
2015-04-23SenateSubstituted CS/CS/CS/HB 157
2015-04-23SenateRead 2nd time
2015-04-21SenateCS/CS/CS by Fiscal Policy read 1st time
2015-04-20SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/23/15
2015-04-20SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2015-04-17SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2015-04-15SenateCS/CS/CS by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2015-04-10SenateOn Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 04/15/15, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2015-04-08SenateNow in Fiscal Policy
2015-04-08SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2015-04-03SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 04/08/15, 10:00 am, 37 Senate Office Building
2015-04-02SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
2015-03-31SenateCS/CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
2015-03-31SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2015-03-30SenateCS/CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2015-03-25SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/30/15, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building
2015-03-03SenateCS by Judiciary read 1st time
2015-03-03SenateIntroduced
2015-02-20SenateNow in Criminal Justice
2015-02-18SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2015-02-17SenateCS by Judiciary; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2015-02-09SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 02/17/15, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2015-01-28SenateReferred to Judiciary; Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Fiscal Policy
2015-01-20SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H0157 (Similar To) 2015-06-17 - Chapter No. 2015-166

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
817011Amended CodeSee Bill Text
81702Amended CodeSee Bill Text
817032Amended CodeSee Bill Text
81711Amended CodeSee Bill Text
81712Amended CodeSee Bill Text
81713Amended CodeSee Bill Text
81714Amended CodeSee Bill Text
81715Amended CodeSee Bill Text
81717Amended CodeSee Bill Text
81718Amended CodeSee Bill Text
81719Amended CodeSee Bill Text
81739Amended CodeSee Bill Text
81740Amended CodeSee Bill Text
817411Amended CodeSee Bill Text
817412Amended CodeSee Bill Text
817414Amended CodeSee Bill Text
817481Amended CodeSee Bill Text
81750Amended CodeSee Bill Text
817568Amended CodeSee Bill Text
817569Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9210022Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/390
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0390/BillText/Filed/HTML
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0390/BillText/c1/HTML
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0390/BillText/c2/HTML
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0390/BillText/c3/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0390/Amendment/323406/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0390/Amendment/145370/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0390/Amendment/488270/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0390/Amendment/538950/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0390/Amendment/376766/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0390/Amendment/797088/HTML

Bill Comments

feedback