FL H0143 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-07 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-33
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Exempt hangars used to assemble or manufacture aircraft from transportation concurrency requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Aircraft Assembly & Manufacturing Hangars [EPSC]

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-04-21 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0021 - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-15 - House - House Roll Call No. 0779 - Passage (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-05-07 Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-33
2010-04-30 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor -HJ 01700
2010-04-22 Ordered enrolled -HJ 00919
2010-04-21 Read 3rd time -SJ 00667; CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 -SJ 00667
2010-04-16 Received -SJ 00648; Referred to Community Affairs; Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations -SJ 00648; Withdrawn from Community Affairs; Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations -SJ 00635; Substituted for SB 1518 -SJ 00635; Read 2nd time -SJ 00635
2010-04-15 In Messages
2010-04-15 Read 3rd time -HJ 00689; CS passed; YEAS 114 NAYS 0 -HJ 00689; Immediately certified -HJ 00714
2010-04-13 Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 00668
2010-04-07 Favorable by- Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 -HJ 00628; Placed on Calendar -HJ 00628
2010-04-05 On Council agenda-- Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council, 04/07/10, 8:00 am, 404-H
2010-03-29 Original reference(s) removed: Policy Council; CS referred to Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00424; Now in Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council
2010-03-26 CS read 1st time on 03/26/10 -HJ 00402; Pending review of CS under Rule 7.20
2010-03-25 CS by Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA); YEAS 12 NAYS 0 -HJ 00408
2010-03-23 PCS on Committee agenda-- Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA), 03/25/10, 9:00 am, Webster Hall
2010-03-02 Introduced, referred to Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA); Policy Council; Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00020
2009-10-23 Referred to Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA); Policy Council; Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council
2009-09-25 Filed

Same As/Similar To

S1518 (Similar To) 2010-04-16 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00635; Substituted CS/HB 143 -SJ 00635; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 143 (Ch. 2010-33) -SJ 00635

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
01633180Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback