FL H0111 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum:
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creates collaborative pharmacy practice agreement between pharmacist & physician; requires agreements to be appropriate to training & scope of practice of pharmacist & physician; requires maintenance of records; requires renewal & continuing education.
Title
Practice of Pharmacy
Sponsors
House Health Quality Subcommittee | Rep. Rene Plasencia [R] | Rep. Tyler Sirois [R] | Rep. James Bush [D] |
Rep. Amy Mercado [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#75 (Y: 99 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Health Policy |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Received |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations; Rules |
2019-04-18 | Senate | In Messages |
2019-04-11 | House | CS passed; YEAS 99 NAYS 16 |
2019-04-11 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-10 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2019-04-10 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-04 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/10/19 |
2019-03-28 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-03-28 | House | Favorable by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-26 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 03/28/19, 8:00 am, Morris Hall |
2019-03-19 | House | Now in Health and Human Services Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Favorable by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 7 NAYS 3 |
2019-03-15 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/19/19, 12:00 pm, Sumner Hall |
2019-03-08 | House | Now in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2019-03-07 | House | CS by Health Quality Subcommittee read 1st time |
2019-03-07 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2019-03-05 | House | CS by Health Quality Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-03-01 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health Quality Subcommittee, 03/05/19, 1:00 pm, Webster Hall |
2019-01-03 | House | Referred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2018-12-18 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H81 (Same As) 2018-12-14 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
S300 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy
H815 (Similar To) 2019-02-15 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
S300 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy
H815 (Similar To) 2019-02-15 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
381 | 0031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
465 | 003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
465 | 1865 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
465 | 1895 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |