FL H0097 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died on Second Reading Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died on Second Reading Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires clerk of court to withhold funds from return of cash bond posted by criminal defendant or his or her spouse, rather than to withhold from return of cash bond posted on behalf of criminal defendant by person other than bail bond agent, funds for specified purposes; requires all cash bond forms to provide specified notice.
Title
Withholding Funds from the Return of Cash Bonds
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-21 - House - House Judiciary Committee (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House Justice Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House Justice Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died on Second Reading Calendar |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-02-21 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2022-02-21 | House | Bill released to House Calendar |
2022-02-21 | House | Reported out of Judiciary Committee |
2022-02-21 | House | Favorable by Judiciary Committee |
2022-02-17 | House | Added to Judiciary Committee agenda |
2022-02-15 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2022-02-15 | House | Reported out of Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-02-15 | House | Favorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-02-11 | House | Added to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee agenda |
2022-02-10 | House | Now in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-02-10 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2022-02-10 | House | Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-02-09 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2022-02-08 | House | CS Filed |
2022-02-08 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2022-02-08 | House | Reported out of Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2022-02-08 | House | Favorable with CS by Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2022-02-04 | House | PCS added to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee agenda |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-09-22 | House | Now in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2021-09-22 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2021-09-22 | House | Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-09-22 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2021-09-14 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1462 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Judiciary