FL H0077 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requires commission to prepare report on energy efficiency with respect to low-income households & rental housing properties to be submitted to Legislature by specified date; provides report requirements.
Title
Florida Energy and Climate Commission
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA) | |
2010-03-30 | Original reference(s) removed: Government Operations Appropriations (CGHC); CS referred to Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA); General Government Policy Council -HJ 00424; Now in Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA) | |
2010-03-29 | CS read 1st time on 03/29/10 -HJ 00412; Pending review of CS under Rule 7.20 | |
2010-03-25 | CS by Energy & Utilities Policy (GGPC); YEAS 9 NAYS 0 -HJ 00417 | |
2010-03-23 | On Committee agenda-- Energy & Utilities Policy (GGPC), 03/25/10, 2:45 pm, Morris Hall | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Energy & Utilities Policy (GGPC); Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA); Government Operations Appropriations (CGHC); General Government Policy Council -HJ 00015 | |
2009-10-01 | Referred to Energy & Utilities Policy (GGPC); Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA); Government Operations Appropriations (CGHC); General Government Policy Council | |
2009-08-19 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0596 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities
S0090 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities
S0090 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities