FL H0073 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Schedules Mitragynine & 7-Hydroxymitragynine, constituents of Kratom, in schedule of controlled substances; provides exception from scheduling for drug product approved by USDA which contains Mitragynine or 7-Hydroxymitragynine; reenacts related provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Controlled Substances

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-11HouseDied in Judiciary Committee
2016-02-11HouseNow in Judiciary Committee
2016-02-10HouseCS by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee read 1st time
2016-02-09HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
2016-02-08HouseCS by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 1
2016-02-04HouseOn Committee agenda-- Justice Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/08/16, 3:00 pm, Reed Hall
2016-02-03HouseNow in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
2016-02-03HouseFavorable by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
2016-02-01HouseOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 02/03/16, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall
2016-01-12HouseIntroduced
2015-09-10HouseReferred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
2015-08-18HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1182 (Same As) 2016-03-11 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
316193Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3222616Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32735Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3901Amended CodeSee Bill Text
440102Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4583265Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4590137Amended CodeSee Bill Text
78204Amended CodeSee Bill Text
78706Amended CodeSee Bill Text
817563Amended CodeSee Bill Text
83131Amended CodeSee Bill Text
856015Amended CodeSee Bill Text
89302Amended CodeSee Bill Text
89303Amended CodeSee Bill Text
893035Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8930356Amended CodeSee Bill Text
89305Amended CodeSee Bill Text
89312Amended CodeSee Bill Text
89313Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9210022Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback