FL S1182 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Scheduling Mitragynine and 7-Hydroxymitragynine, constituents of Kratom, in a schedule of controlled substances; providing an exception from scheduling for any drug product approved by the United States Food and Drug Administration which contains Mitragynine or 7-Hydroxymitragynine, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Controlled Substances

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-11SenateDied in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
2016-02-18SenateCS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
2016-02-17SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
2016-02-16SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2016-02-16SenateCS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 3 NAYS 2
2016-02-11SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 02/16/16, 10:00 am, 37 Senate Office Building
2016-02-03SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 02/08/16, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building --Not Considered
2016-01-12SenateIntroduced
2016-01-08SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations
2015-12-17SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H0073 (Same As) 2016-03-11 - Died in Judiciary Committee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
316193Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3222616Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32735Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3901Amended CodeSee Bill Text
440102Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4583265Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4590137Amended CodeSee Bill Text
78204Amended CodeSee Bill Text
78706Amended CodeSee Bill Text
817563Amended CodeSee Bill Text
83131Amended CodeSee Bill Text
856015Amended CodeSee Bill Text
89302Amended CodeSee Bill Text
89303Amended CodeSee Bill Text
893035Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8930356Amended CodeSee Bill Text
89305Amended CodeSee Bill Text
89312Amended CodeSee Bill Text
89313Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9210022Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback