FL H0059 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Creates Prescription Drug Donation Repository Program within DOH; provides criteria & conditions for donation of prescription drugs & supplies from certain authorized entities for dispensing to eligible patients; authorizes Governor to waive program patient eligibility requirements during declared state of emergency; authorizes positions & provides appropriations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prescription Drug Donation Repository Program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#169 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Health Policy
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-04-24SenateReceived
2019-04-24SenateReferred to Health Policy; Appropriations
2019-04-23SenateIn Messages
2019-04-17HouseCS passed; YEAS 114 NAYS 0
2019-04-17HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-17HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-11HouseCS/CS/CS by Health and Human Services Committee read 1st time
2019-04-11HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/17/19
2019-04-11HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-04-11HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-04-09HouseCS/CS/CS by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
2019-04-05HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 04/09/19, 2:00 pm, Morris Hall
2019-04-03HouseCS/CS by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee read 1st time
2019-04-03HouseNow in Health and Human Services Committee
2019-04-02HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-04-02HouseCS/CS by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2019-03-29HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee, 04/02/19, 1:00 pm, Sumner Hall
2019-03-05HouseCS by Health Quality Subcommittee read 1st time
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-02-27HouseNow in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
2019-02-22HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-02-20HouseCS by Health Quality Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
2019-02-13HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health Quality Subcommittee, 02/20/19, 4:00 pm, Mashburn Hall
2019-01-03HouseReferred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
2018-11-28HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S104 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
25236Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4651902Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback