FL H0029 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-11 - Chapter No. 2010-231; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230)

Summary

Designates Ray Charles Memorial Parkway in Madison County, Deputy Victor J. "Skip" McDonald Memorial Highway & Trooper Charles Eugene Campbell Memorial Highway in Taylor County, Frank Pasquarella Way, Bob Arbetter's Way, & Don Shula Drive in Miami-Dade County, Captain Chad Allen Reed, Sr., Memorial Highway in Dixie County, & Trooper Ronald Gordon Smith Memorial Bridge in Citrus County; directs DOT to erect suitable markers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Road and Bridge Designations [CPSC]

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-06-11 Chapter No. 2010-231; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230)
2010-04-06 Approved by Governor -HJ 00629
2010-03-30 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor -HJ 00426
2010-03-25 Ordered enrolled -HJ 00400
2010-03-24 Withdrawn from Transportation -SJ 00328; Substituted for CS/SB 1698 -SJ 00328; Read 2nd time -SJ 00328; Read 3rd time -SJ 00328; CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 -SJ 00328
2010-03-23 In Messages; Received -SJ 00323; Referred to Transportation -SJ 00323
2010-03-23 Read 3rd time -HJ 00363; CS passed as amended; YEAS 115 NAYS 0 -HJ 00363; Immediately certified -HJ 00363
2010-03-18 Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 00329; Amendment(s) adopted -HJ 00330
2010-03-08 Placed on Calendar -HJ 00224
2010-03-05 CS read 1st time on 03/05/10 -HJ 00220; Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.20
2010-03-03 CS/CS by- Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 -HJ 00221
2010-03-02 Introduced, referred to Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA); Transportation & Economic Development Appropriations (CEED); Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00011; On Committee agenda-- Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA), 11/04/09, 8:00 am, 404-H; Favorable by Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA); YEAS 12 NAYS 0 -HJ 00164; Now in Transportation & Economic Development Appropriations (CEED) -HJ 00164; On Committee agenda-- Transportation & Economic Development Appropriations (CEED), 01/12/10, 1:00 pm, Morris Hall; CS by Transportation & Economic Development Appropriations (CEED); YEAS 14 NAYS 0 -HJ 00165; CS read 1st time on 03/02/10 -HJ 00153; Pending review of CS under Rule 7.20; Now in Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00163; On Council agenda-- Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council, 03/03/10, 10:45 am, 404-H
2010-03-01 On Council agenda-- Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council, 03/03/10, 10:45 am, 404-H
2010-01-20 Now in Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council
2010-01-15 Pending review of CS under Rule 7.20
2010-01-12 CS by Transportation & Economic Development Appropriations (CEED); YEAS 14 NAYS 0
2010-01-05 On Committee agenda-- Transportation & Economic Development Appropriations (CEED), 01/12/10, 1:00 pm, Morris Hall
2009-11-04 Favorable by Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA); YEAS 12 NAYS 0; Now in Transportation & Economic Development Appropriations (CEED)
2009-10-28 On Committee agenda-- Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA), 11/04/09, 8:00 am, 404-H
2009-10-01 Referred to Roads, Bridges, & Ports Policy (EDCA); Transportation & Economic Development Appropriations (CEED); Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council
2009-07-22 Filed

Same As/Similar To

S0180 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 29 (Ch. 2010-231)
S1698 (Similar To) 2010-03-24 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00328; Amendment(s) adopted (835946) -SJ 00328; Substituted CS/CS/HB 29 -SJ 00328; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 29 (Ch. 2010-231), HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230) -SJ 00328
S0486 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 29 (Ch. 2010-231)
H0005 (Similar To) 2010-06-11 - Chapter No. 2010-230; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 29 (Ch. 2010-231), CS/HB 321 (Ch. 2010-232), CS/CS/HB 1033 (Ch. 2010-233), CS/SB 2054 (Ch. 2010-229)

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback