FL S1698 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-24 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00328; Amendment(s) adopted (835946) -SJ 00328; Substituted CS/CS/HB 29 -SJ 00328; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 29 (Ch. 2010-231), HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230) -SJ 00328
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-24 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00328; Amendment(s) adopted (835946) -SJ 00328; Substituted CS/CS/HB 29 -SJ 00328; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 29 (Ch. 2010-231), HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230) -SJ 00328
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Designates Deputy Victor J. "Skip" McDonald Memorial Highway in Taylor County. Designates Trooper Charles Eugene Campbell Memorial Highway in Taylor County. Designates Ray Charles Memorial Parkway in Madison County. Designates Frank Pasquarella Way and Bob Arbetter's Way in Miami-Dade County. Designates Trooper Ronald Gordon Smith Memorial Bridge in Citrus County. Designates the Chad Allen Reed, Sr., Memorial Highway in Dixie County, etc.
Title
Road Designations [CPSC]
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-24 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00328; Amendment(s) adopted (835946) -SJ 00328; Substituted CS/CS/HB 29 -SJ 00328; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 29 (Ch. 2010-231), HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230) -SJ 00328 | |
2010-03-15 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 00191 | |
2010-03-11 | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2010-03-10 | CS by- Transportation; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 -SJ 00191; CS read 1st time on 03/11/10 -SJ 00246 | |
2010-03-05 | On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 03/10/10, 8:00 am, 37-S | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Transportation -SJ 00116 | |
2010-02-10 | Referred to Transportation | |
2010-02-04 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0486 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 29 (Ch. 2010-231)
H0029 (Similar To) 2010-06-11 - Chapter No. 2010-231; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230)
S0180 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 29 (Ch. 2010-231)
H0005 (Similar To) 2010-06-11 - Chapter No. 2010-230; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 29 (Ch. 2010-231), CS/HB 321 (Ch. 2010-232), CS/CS/HB 1033 (Ch. 2010-233), CS/SB 2054 (Ch. 2010-229)
H0029 (Similar To) 2010-06-11 - Chapter No. 2010-231; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230)
S0180 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Transportation, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 29 (Ch. 2010-231)
H0005 (Similar To) 2010-06-11 - Chapter No. 2010-230; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 29 (Ch. 2010-231), CS/HB 321 (Ch. 2010-232), CS/CS/HB 1033 (Ch. 2010-233), CS/SB 2054 (Ch. 2010-229)