FL H0025 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Revises required information to be included in application for renewal of registration of employee organization; provides for revocation of certification under certain conditions; requires certain employee organizations to recertify as certified bargaining agents; provides nonapplicability with respect to employee organizations that represent or seek to represent certain employees; provides appropriation & authorizes positions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Labor Organizations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#537 (Y: 65 N: 41 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Commerce and Tourism
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-02-01SenateReceived
2018-02-01SenateReferred to Commerce and Tourism; Appropriations; Rules
2018-01-31SenateIn Messages
2018-01-25HouseCS passed; YEAS 65 NAYS 41
2018-01-25HouseRead 3rd time
2018-01-24HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-01-24HouseRead 2nd time 401
2018-01-18HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 01/24/18
2018-01-09HouseCS by Government Accountability Committee read 1st time
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2017-12-07HousePlaced on Calendar
2017-12-06HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2017-12-05HouseCS by- Government Accountability Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 9
2017-11-28HousePCS on Committee agenda-- Government Accountability Committee, 12/05/17, 10:30 am, Morris Hall
2017-11-08HouseReferred to Government Accountability Committee
2017-10-31HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1036 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Commerce and Tourism

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
447305Amended CodeSee Bill Text
447307Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback