FL H0013 | 2015 | 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2506-A (Ch. 2015-224), SB 2500-A (Ch. 2015-232)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Directs DBPR to implement Florida Business Information Portal; specifies contents of portal; requires state agencies to cooperate with DBPR to develop, implement, & update portal; requires DBPR to submit report to Governor & Legislature; specifies required elements of report; repeals provisions relating to One-Stop Business Registration Portal & terminates related trust fund within DOR.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Florida Business Information Portal

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-04HouseLaid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2506-A (Ch. 2015-224), SB 2500-A (Ch. 2015-232)
2015-06-04HouseTemporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading
2015-06-03HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 06/04/15
2015-06-01HouseReferred to Calendar
2015-06-01HouseIntroduced
2015-05-27HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S2506 (Similar To) 2015-06-23 - Chapter No. 2015-224, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500-A (Ch. 2015-232)
H0001 (Similar To) 2015-06-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500-A (Ch. 2015-232), SB 2502-A (Ch. 2015-222), SB 2504-A (Ch. 2015-223), SB 2506-A (Ch. 2015-224), SB 2508-A (Ch. 2015-225), SB 2510-A (Ch. 2015-226), SB 2512-A (Ch. 2015-227), SB 2514-A (Ch. 2015-228), SB 2516-A (Ch. 2015-229), SB 2520-A (Ch. 2015-230), SB 2522-A (Ch. 2015-231)
S2500 (Similar To) 2015-08-18 - Line Item Veto Message referred to Rules

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20166Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2151995Amended CodeSee Bill Text
288109Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback