FL H0011 | 2015 | 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500-A (Ch. 2015-232), SB 2510-A (Ch. 2015-226)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Revises recurring core services funding for community-based care lead agencies; requires DCF to receive legislative authorization before seeking, applying for, accepting, or renewing any waiver of work requirements under SNAP.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of Children and Families

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-04HouseLaid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500-A (Ch. 2015-232), SB 2510-A (Ch. 2015-226)
2015-06-04HouseTemporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading
2015-06-03HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 06/04/15
2015-06-01HouseReferred to Calendar
2015-06-01HouseIntroduced
2015-05-27HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S2510 (Similar To) 2015-06-23 - Chapter No. 2015-226, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500-A (Ch. 2015-232)
H0001 (Similar To) 2015-06-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500-A (Ch. 2015-232), SB 2502-A (Ch. 2015-222), SB 2504-A (Ch. 2015-223), SB 2506-A (Ch. 2015-224), SB 2508-A (Ch. 2015-225), SB 2510-A (Ch. 2015-226), SB 2512-A (Ch. 2015-227), SB 2514-A (Ch. 2015-228), SB 2516-A (Ch. 2015-229), SB 2520-A (Ch. 2015-230), SB 2522-A (Ch. 2015-231)
S2500 (Similar To) 2015-08-18 - Line Item Veto Message referred to Rules

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
409991Amended CodeSee Bill Text
414455Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback