FL S2510 | 2015 | 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-23 - Chapter No. 2015-226, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500-A (Ch. 2015-232)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Revising the equity allocation model for funding community-based care lead agencies; defining the term "proportion of child population"; revising the term "proportion of children in care"; requiring the department to receive legislative authorization before seeking, applying for, accepting, or renewing any waiver of work requirements under the federal Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of Children and Families

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-06-19 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#433 (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#4 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#400 (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#7 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-23 Chapter No. 2015-226, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500-A (Ch. 2015-232)
2015-06-23 Approved by Governor
2015-06-19 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2015-06-19SenateOrdered engrossed, then enrolled
2015-06-19HousePassed as amended by Conference Committee Report; YEAS 112 NAYS 0
2015-06-19HouseConference Committee Report adopted (249258)
2015-06-19HouseConference Committee Report considered
2015-06-19HouseIn returning messages
2015-06-19SenatePassed as amended by Conference Committee Report; YEAS 37 NAYS 0
2015-06-19SenateConference Committee Report adopted (249258)
2015-06-19SenateConference Committee Report received
2015-06-05SenateConference Committee appointed: Appropriations Conference Committee: Lee (Chair), Benacquisto (Vice Chair), Flores (At Large), Galvano (At Large), Grimsley (At Large), Joyner (At Large), Margolis (At Large), Richter (At Large), Simmons (At Large), Smith (At Large); Appropriations Conference Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice/Justice: Negron (Chair), Bradley, Evers, Flores, Hutson, Joyner; Appropriations Conference Committee on Education/Education: Gaetz (Chair), Bullard, Galvano, Legg, Montford, Simmons, Stargel; Appropriations Conference Committee on General Government/Government Operations: Hays (Chair), Altman, Braynon, Dean, Margolis, Simpson; Appropriations Conference Committee on Health and Human Services/Health Care: Garcia (Chair), Bean, Benacquisto, Grimsley, Richter, Smith, Sobel; Appropriations Conference Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development/Transportation and Economic Development: Latvala (Chair), Brandes, Clemens, Detert, Diaz de la Portilla, Gibson, Hukill, Sachs, Thompson
2015-06-05HouseConference Committee appointed: Representatives Corcoran (Chair), Boyd (Vice Chair), Hudson (Chair), Brodeur, Cummings, Fant, Harrell, Magar, Pigman, Renner, Stevenson, Berman, Cruz, Murphy, Richardson, Albritton (At Large), Caldwell (At Large), Diaz, J. (At Large), Eisnaugle (At Large), Fresen (At Large), Gaetz (At Large), Goodson (At Large), Ingram (At Large), McBurney (At Large), Metz (At Large), Nunez (At Large), Oliva (At Large), O'Toole (At Large), Porter (At Large), Raschein (At Large), Wood (At Large), Young (At Large), Clarke-Reed (At Large), Jones, M. (At Large), Pafford (At Large), Rouson (At Large), Stafford (At Large), Williams (At Large)
2015-06-04SenateIn returning messages
2015-06-04HouseRefused to pass the Senate bill as passed by the Senate and acceded to the request for conference
2015-06-04HousePassed as amended; YEAS 106 NAYS 0
2015-06-04HouseRead 3rd time
2015-06-04HouseAmendment(s) adopted (008151)
2015-06-04HouseRead 2nd time
2015-06-03HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 06/04/15
2015-06-03HouseReceived
2015-06-03HouseReferred to Calendar
2015-06-01HouseIn Messages
2015-06-01SenateThe Senate requests that the House pass the bill as passed by the Senate or agree to include the bill in the Budget Conference
2015-06-01SenatePassed; YEAS 35 NAYS 0
2015-06-01SenateRead 3rd time
2015-06-01SenateRead 2nd time
2015-06-01SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2015-06-01SenateWithdrawn from Appropriations
2015-06-01SenateReferred to Appropriations
2015-06-01SenateIntroduced
2015-05-22SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S2500 (Similar To) 2015-08-18 - Line Item Veto Message referred to Rules
H0011 (Similar To) 2015-06-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500-A (Ch. 2015-232), SB 2510-A (Ch. 2015-226)
H0001 (Similar To) 2015-06-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500-A (Ch. 2015-232), SB 2502-A (Ch. 2015-222), SB 2504-A (Ch. 2015-223), SB 2506-A (Ch. 2015-224), SB 2508-A (Ch. 2015-225), SB 2510-A (Ch. 2015-226), SB 2512-A (Ch. 2015-227), SB 2514-A (Ch. 2015-228), SB 2516-A (Ch. 2015-229), SB 2520-A (Ch. 2015-230), SB 2522-A (Ch. 2015-231)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
409991Amended CodeSee Bill Text
414455Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback