DE SB80 | 2009-2010 | 145th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-2)
Status: Introduced on April 30 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-08 - SS 1 for SB 80 - Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate
Pending: Senate Health & Social Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 30 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-08 - SS 1 for SB 80 - Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate
Pending: Senate Health & Social Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Bill creates the Delaware Health Consortium, charged with implementing and operating a State wide health information network. The network will enable ready communication throughout the State of clinical and financial health information. It establishes a twelve member oversight board, governed under the Freedom of Information Act, to adopt bylaws and to govern the affairs of the DHC. The Bill also provides for criminal and civil immunity from suit for Board members and employees conducting the affairs of the DHC. It also requires an annual report and annual audits of the DHC’s operations and financial positions.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Delaware Health Consortium.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-08 | SS 1 for SB 80 - Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate | |
2009-06-24 | Amendment SA 3 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate | |
2009-06-11 | Laid On Table in Senate | |
2009-06-11 | Amendment SA 1 - Laid On Table in Senate | |
2009-06-11 | Amendment SA 1 - Introduced in Senate | |
2009-05-06 | Reported Out of Committee (ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES/ELECTIONS) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits | |
2009-04-30 | Assigned to Administrative Services/Elections Committee in Senate |